+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1536ER)
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (25-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/20/02 032480208
+ − Votes (5)
February 6, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2003: Reported from Appropriations (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor