+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On February 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left in Education and Health
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Education and Health
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Motion to reconsider insist on substitute agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (49-Y 49-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 17105323D-S1 (49-Y 49-N)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House
- VOTE: REJECTED (46-Y 54-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 17105323D-S1 (46-Y 54-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 17105323D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 6-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended HB1534S1
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 17105323D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N)
- Read third time and passed House (51-Y 46-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1534H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104854D-H1
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17104854D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On December 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102700D