+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 645 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1533ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chair votes Yes
- Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1533H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106612D-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18106612D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 18104025D
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2018: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor