+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 9-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101604D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 9-N)
February 4, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Lee J. Carter
Type:
Primary Sponsor