+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0639)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 639 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB153ER)
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Stanley, Reeves, Mason
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Delegates: Habeeb, Marshall, James
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107740D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107740D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB153S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18107740D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources agreed to
- Committee amendment from Appropriations agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB153E
- Printed as engrossed 18103142D-E
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #2
On December 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103142D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Votes (13)
March 9, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2018: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
March 1, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor