+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 606 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1525ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 5-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1525H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106659D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18106659D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 18105143D
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2018: Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
March 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 5-N)
February 14, 2018: Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor