+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 564 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1521ER)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (88-Y 10-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 10-N)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1521S1
- Substitute by Senator Puckett agreed to 065522336-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Floor substitute printed 065522336-S1 (Puckett)
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1521H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 067550396-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 067550396-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 069838396
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 10-N)
March 8, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2006: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor