+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossment refused by House
- Amendments by Del. Black rejected
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House
- VOTE: DEFEATED (48-Y 51-N)
- Defeated by House (48-Y 51-N)
- Read third time
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 032549636-H1
- Pending question ordered
- Committee substitute agreed to 032549636-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 032549636-H1
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (18-Y 3-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/19/02 035961636