+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Failed to pass
- No further action taken
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Finance Committee substitute agreed to 18107756D-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Courts of Justice Committee substitute rejected 18107550D-S1
- Read third time
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18107756D-S2
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107550D-S1
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1516H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106978D-H1
- Read second time
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18106978D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 18101527D