+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 8 (effective 2/16/95)
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1516ER)
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (16-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 2
On January 11, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg. clause LD8495424
+ − Votes (5)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1995: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
January 20, 1995: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor