+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 31, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
On March 22, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 573 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1513ER)
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1513H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 055458276-H1
- Read second time
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 055458276-H1
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Law
On November 8, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 054364276
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2005: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2005: Reported from C. J. with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor