+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1512H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 052277448-H1
- Read second time
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 052277448-H1
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #1
On November 8, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 051168276