+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day in General Laws by voice vote
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 991576492-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 991576492-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (25-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 991576492-H1
On January 14, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/22/98 992008450
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: Reported from General Laws with sub. (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor