+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Failed to pass
- No further action taken
- VOTE: ADOPTION (45-Y 46-N)
- Conference report rejected by House (45-Y 46-N)
- Amended by conference committee
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators: Peake, Newman, Howell
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Delegates: Cline, Landes, Keam
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED #2 (46-Y 46-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (46-Y 46-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House
- VOTE: REJECTED (45-Y 51-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (45-Y 51-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (11-Y 5-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 49-N)
- Read third time and passed House (51-Y 49-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 18105109D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1504E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 9-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N)
- Reconsidered by Education
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed 18105109D