+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0155)
On March 23, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 155 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1501ER)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1501H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 064785260-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 064785260-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 063867260
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2006: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor