+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 3 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 02/12/18
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2018
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB150ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 4-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On December 20, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101331D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Votes (8)
February 6, 2018: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
February 6, 2018: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
February 6, 2018: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 4-N)
January 24, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor