+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 8, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
On March 28, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 775 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1495ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (93-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 2-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Read second time
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Claims (16-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Claims
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/18/98 995109446
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N 1-A)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 2-N)
February 7, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
January 20, 1999: Reported from Claims (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor