+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 397 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1492ER)
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 991317144-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amds. (25-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/18/98 991317144