+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Enacted, Chapter 775 (effective 7/1/17)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1491ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1491ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1491E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 17101086D-E
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101086D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 5, 2017: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 5, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor