+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 144 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1490ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 15103990D-H1
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 15103990D-EH1
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1490EH1
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 15103990D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Education Reform
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102028D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 16, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2015: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor