+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0019)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 19 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB149ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N)
On December 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102414D
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2014: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor