+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0881)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1487ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 881 (effective 7/1/06)
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1487ER)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 069831448
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 069831448
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2006: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2006: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor