+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Enacted, Chapter 763 (effective 7/1/11)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1487ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1487ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105089D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1487H1
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11105089D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On December 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100756D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 6, 2011: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 6, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor