+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (12-Y 8-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 18105062D
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor