+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 706 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0706)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1486ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (73-Y 24-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106602D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1486H1
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 8-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106602D-H1
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104701D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2018: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor