+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 14, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 702 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1486ER)
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 067757348-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1486S1
- Read third time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 067757348-S1
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1486H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 067718348-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 067718348-H1
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Prof./Occup./Admin. (Cosgrove)
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 062217348
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2006: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor