+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 753 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1485ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (77-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 21-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106551D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1485H1
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106551D-H1
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18105077D
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 21-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Education with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
February 2, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor