+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 18, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0154)
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1485ER)
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 154 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1485ER)
On February 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 1-N)
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 5
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 961296812
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 1996: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
February 15, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1996: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 1-N)
February 7, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1996: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor