+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0136)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 136 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1483ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1483H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104809D-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17104809D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102023D
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2017: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor