+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0295)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 295 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1476ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Amendment by Senator Chafin agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102197D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor