+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0111)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 111 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1476ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1476H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104362D-H1
- Read second time
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Incorporates HB1865
- Committee substitute printed 13104362D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #1
On January 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101547D