+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 510 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1475ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106880D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1475H1
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106880D-H1
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18105028D
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor