+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government and Technology (Wardrup)
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed 068861496
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2006: Left in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2006: Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor