+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 21, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290)
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 290 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1471ER)
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read first time
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD8417376-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amemdment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 4
On January 11, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/95 LD8417376
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1995: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1995: Reported from C. C. T. with amemdment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor