+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 560 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1460ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 18104545D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1460E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 18104545D
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor