+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 216 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0216)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB146ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
On December 19, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102430D
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
+ − Votes (7)
February 22, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor