+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
- Bill became law, Chapter 758 (effective 7/1/11)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed in enrolled form (29-Y 11-N)
- Motion to reconsider passed in enrolled form agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed in enrolled form (30-Y 10-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (93-Y 7-N)
- Governor's veto overridden (93-Y 7-N)
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On February 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1459ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 7-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (89-Y 7-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 8-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104935D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1459H1
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104935D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N)
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
On November 30, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100861D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
April 6, 2011: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (93-Y 7-N)
April 6, 2011: Passed in enrolled form (29-Y 11-N)
April 6, 2011: Passed in enrolled form (30-Y 10-N)
February 16, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 7-N)
February 14, 2011: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N)
January 31, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor