+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 2, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 622 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1458ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 20102944D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1458E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102944D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
February 28, 2020: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Kathleen Murphy
Type:
Primary Sponsor