+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Left in Judiciary
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judiciary
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (8-Y 7-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103461D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Reported from Transportation (8-Y 7-N)
February 3, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2020: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Steve E. Heretick
Type:
Primary Sponsor