+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 24 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1455ER)
- Enrolled
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 17101736D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1455E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101736D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 9, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2017: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
January 18, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor