+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 264 (effective 10/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1455ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1455H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104727D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104727D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On December 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102784D