+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0021)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 21 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1454ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On November 22, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100654D
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2011: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 13, 2011: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor