+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0230)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 230 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1453ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 2-N)
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (76-Y 22-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (76-Y 22-N)
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 088802660-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1453E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 7-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: 1
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 088802660
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2008: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
February 20, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2008: Reported from Finance (13-Y 2-N)
February 7, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (76-Y 22-N)
February 4, 2008: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor