+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 190 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1452ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On December 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101226D
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2015: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor