+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363)
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 363 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1452ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate sub. agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 994820376-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 994820376-S1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (11-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 994820376-S1
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Read second time and engrossed
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 10/26/98 990402376
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 1-N)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (11-Y 1-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor