+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 192 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1451ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (30-Y 7-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 29-N)
- Read third time and passed House (68-Y 29-N)
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 10-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #2
On November 22, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100546D
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2011: Passed Senate (30-Y 7-N)
February 9, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 29-N)
January 24, 2011: Reported from Finance (12-Y 10-N)
January 19, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor