+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 415 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1451ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107624D-S1 (99-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1451S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107624D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18107624D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1451H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106739D-H1
- Read second time
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18106739D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 18104925D