+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Delegates: Sullivan, Lopez, O'Quinn
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stuart, Mason, Petersen
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendments (37-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
- Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 97-N)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (22-Y 18-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (8-Y 7-N)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
- Read third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107907D-H1
- Read second time
- Amendments by Delegate Sullivan agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1451EH1
- Printed as engrossed 20107907D-EH1
On February 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20107907D-H1
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104976D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
February 28, 2020: Senate insisted on amendments (37-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
February 24, 2020: Passed Senate with amendments (22-Y 18-N)
February 20, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (8-Y 7-N)
February 11, 2020: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
February 6, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
February 4, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Richard C. "Rip" Sullivan, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor