+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
On March 7, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 450 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1449ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1449H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 083357804-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 083357804-H1
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented and ordered printed 088907520