+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0185)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 185 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1448ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1448H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104135D-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104135D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On December 27, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101809D